THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:49:20 PM
Ibrahim, Amir Abdulahi
CPSO#:
83306
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English, Ethiopian, German, Russian
Education: Vinnitsa Medical Inst. N.Pirogov, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-0006
Fax: (905) 623-7676
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIR ABDULAHI IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2011 |