THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:41:02 AM
Tay, Keng Yeow
CPSO#:
83297
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52340
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENG YEOW TAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2010 |