THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:21:13 AM
Karimi Zandi, Shahram
CPSO#:
83287
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHRAM KARIMI ZANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARIMI ZANDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |