THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 9:33:55 AM
Hayter Rawnsley, Megan Alexandra
CPSO#:
83278
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Hayter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jan 2022 |