THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:12:36 AM
Jiaravuthisan, Michael Manussavee
CPSO#:
83273
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Thai
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
690 Dorval Dr
Suite 201-A
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Phone: 365-333-3376
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MANUSSAVEE JIARAVUTHISAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIARAVUTHISAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)