THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:13:30 AM
Lee, Edward Yoon-Seok
CPSO#:
83254
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
761 Jane St
2nd Floor
York ON M6N 4B4
Phone: 4167608677
Fax: 4167602811
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Y.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD YOON-SEOK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 17 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2006 to 16 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2018 |