THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:53:49 AM
Garani, Osama Haider
CPSO#:
83253
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4056 Dorchester Road
Unit 200
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6M9
Phone: (905) 2289955
Fax: 9052280990
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OSAMA HAIDER GARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2005
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 30 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2015 |