THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:56:11 AM
Nimir, Asim Babo
CPSO#:
83249
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Akan, Arabic, English
Education: University of Khartoum, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medi-Share G70 -339Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 4P8
Phone: 519-8582333
Fax: 519-8583603
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Asim Nimir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jan 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASIM BABO NIMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2011 |