THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:48:39 PM
Predescu, Dragos
CPSO#:
83247
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. Predescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 19 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2021 |