THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:58:31 PM
Pierse, Michael Patrick
CPSO#:
83246
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Patrick Pierse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1G 6W3
Date Received: 30 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2017 |