THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:26:32 AM
Kobeleva, Sofya
CPSO#:
83242
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:28 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOFYA KOBELEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBELEVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
AVP - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2012 |