THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:18:58 AM
Samadi, Nooshin
CPSO#:
83241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
311-531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 235-5737
Fax: (905) 235-5738
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NOOSHIN SAMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Sep 2005
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2010 |