THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:21:50 AM
Ogunkeye, Alarape Oluwatosin
CPSO#:
83240
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
365 Vine Street
Unit 4
St Catharines ON L2M 4T9
Phone: (905) 346-1050
Fax: (905) 346-1051
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALARAPE OLUWATOSIN OGUNKEYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUNKEYE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2010 |