THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:24:38 PM
Rigamonti, Andrea
CPSO#:
83238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Milan, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:25 May 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Nov 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2015 |
|
Active |