THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:39:36 AM
DeAngelis, Matthew Anthony
CPSO#:
83222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
117 Centrepointe Drive Unit #205
Ottawa ON K2G 5X3
Phone: (613) 695-5334
Fax: (613) 695-5336
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANTHONY DEANGELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANGELIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2008 |