THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:42:41 PM
Pan, Ming
CPSO#:
83217
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, French, Mandarin
Education: Tianjin Medical University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MING PAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
AVP - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |