THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:19:38 PM
Fotheringham, John Morson
CPSO#:
83214
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
123 Marks St
Atikokan ON P0T 1C0
Phone: (807) 597 2721
Fax: (807) 597 4632
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Hornepayne Community Hospital |
Hornepayne |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN MORSON FOTHERINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOTHERINGHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2007 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: October 20, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
John Morson Fotheringham was found guilty of the following offence(s):
1. Three counts of Fail to Comply with an Undertaking, contrary to Section 145(4)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Fail to Comply with a Recognizance, contrary to Section 811 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: October 20, 2022
SENTENCE: Conditional discharge with 12 months probation, concurrent on all counts, and victim surcharges;
Probation conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and promptly notify the court or probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4. Report to a probation officer by within 5 working days and remain under the supervision of that probation officer and after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer, probation officer to assist in your supervision.
5. Do not contact or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named people, with specified exception.
5. Do not attend at any place where named people live, work, go to school or frequent.
6. Do not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.
7. Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer.
9. You shall sign any release of information forms as will enable your probation officer to monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative programs as directed. However the release will be limited so such they will not be providing the probation officer any of your detailed medical information or contents of your discussions that you have with your service providers.
10. And remain under the care of a physician.