THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:06:31 PM
Ezer, Darren Paul
CPSO#:
83192
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. |
Markham |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARREN PAUL EZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EZER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2010 |