THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:54:54 AM
Ninan, Vadakethu Thomas
CPSO#:
83191
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Hospital Drive Site
Department of Internal Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VADAKETHU THOMAS NINAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NINAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2008 |