THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:36:16 AM
Rana, Alia Waqas
CPSO#:
83181
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Rana, Alia (used until: 18 Dec 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALIA WAQAS RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2009 |