THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:55:22 AM
Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi, Behrooz Hamid
CPSO#:
83174
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, Farsi, Russian
Education: The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:19 Nov 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEHROOZ HAMID MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 11 Sep 2005
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2009 |