THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:56:35 PM
Miller-Monthrope, Yvette Elouise
CPSO#:
83155
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
B12-300 North Service Rd W
Wellmedica Dermatology Centre
Oakville
Units B12-B13
Oakville ON L6M 2R9
Phone: 905-338-3730
Fax: 905-338-3731
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:04 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YVETTE ELOUISE MILLER-MONTHROPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER-MONTHROPE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 10 Jan 2022
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |