THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:45:54 PM
Braithwaite-Walton, Heather Jean
CPSO#:
83142
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
400 Broad St W
Dunnville ON N1A 2P7
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 May 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER JEAN BRAITHWAITE-WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAITHWAITE-WALTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2020 |