THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:31:03 PM
Seif-Zadeh, Atih amanda
CPSO#:
83141
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Spartan Health Sciences University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1762 Westwood blvd
Los angeles CA 90024
United States
Phone: 4246451918
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Seif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Maryland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Apr 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATIH AMANDA SEIF-ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIF-ZADEH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2006 |