THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:04:50 AM
Hussain, Nusrat
CPSO#:
83132
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Punjab, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
28 Prince of Wales Ct
Buffalo NY 14221-1900
United States
Phone: +1-716-345-807
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nusrat Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:26 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NUSRAT HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |