THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:01:41 PM
Pavlova, Viktoria Valeriyevna
CPSO#:
83130
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Arkhangelsk State Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ancaster Medical Centre
Suite 204
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Phone: 289-445-1071
Fax: 289-855-2838
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:14 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKTORIA VALERIYEVNA PAVLOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVLOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2007 to 14 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2008 to 14 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 14 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2009 |