THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:53:10 PM
Khalid, Zahira
CPSO#:
83113
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZAHIRA KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2009 |