THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:58:29 PM
Tauqir, Syeda Naghmana
CPSO#:
83111
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
Dept Of Anatomic Pathology
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 3404
Fax: (519) 421-4237
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYEDA NAGHMANA TAUQIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUQIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2010 |