THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:45:30 AM
Kurian, Annie
CPSO#:
83097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: University of Lille II, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 7201
Fax: 5193837274
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNIE KURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |