THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:25:48 PM
Goodarzi, Masoud Eftekhari
CPSO#:
83068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Tagalog
Education: Far Eastern University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6055 Main St.
Niagara Falls ON L2A 6A1
Phone: (289) 296-6880
Fax: (289) 296-8876
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MASOUD EFTEKHARI GOODARZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODARZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2010 |