THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:11:12 AM
Hayman, Coryn Allan Richard
CPSO#:
83066
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 May 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Coryn A. R. Hayman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 28 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 22 May 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Dec 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 16 Dec 2020 |
|
Active |