THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:33:15 PM
Masood, Amna
CPSO#:
83064
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 437-6092
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Amna Masood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMNA MASOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 24 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Jul 2009 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2012 |