THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:32:41 AM
Hampel, Elizabeth Maria
CPSO#:
83062
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 49463
Fax: (289) 398-1067
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARIA HAMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMPEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |