THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:47:25 PM
Alavi, Afsaneh
CPSO#:
83058
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 May 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 First street, SW, Mayo clinic
rochester MN 55902
United States
Phone: 507-293-3820
Fax: 507-538-6239
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AFSANEH ALAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 23 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2020 |