THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:10:57 PM
Kumar, Pawan Prabhat
CPSO#:
83057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON P1B 7K8
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAWAN PRABHAT KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 23 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |