THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:25:51 AM
Lipson, David
CPSO#:
83053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Providence Healthcare
Toronto ON M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3619
Fax: (416) 285-3764
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Health Care,Toronto |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:07 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID LIPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2013 |