THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:44:19 PM
Rizk, Sarah Zaki Yanni Hanna
CPSO#:
83048
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 May 2020 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 14, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sarah Zaki Yanni Rizk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 14, 2021:
Following a reassessment of her practice which raised concerns about
her standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Rizk was required to
undergo remediation and submit to a further reassessment. In lieu of
submitting to the further reassessment, Dr. Rizk has ceased to practise
medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or
provide any medical advice or services.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)