THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:26:52 AM
El-Mallah, Medhat William Rezk Allah Hanna
CPSO#:
83047
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Minya, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corp Oshawa Div
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 35441
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEDHAT WILLIAM REZK ALLAH HANNA EL-MALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-MALLAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
AVP - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |