THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:13:13 PM
Bhaduri, Mousumi Samar
CPSO#:
83044
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Pune, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55341
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:24 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |