THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 9:36:17 AM
Elser, Christine
CPSO#:
83043
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Universitat Ulm, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Marvelle Koffler Breast Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 1286
600 University Avneue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-3202
Fax: (416) 586-4545
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:20 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Jul 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
|
Active |