THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:29:53 AM
Roqueyya, Rubina
CPSO#:
83038
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Chittagong, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Danforth Family Care Centre
2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 1M3
Phone: (416) 690-9000
Fax: (416) 690-9005
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUBINA ROQUEYYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROQUEYYA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2008 |