THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:54:55 PM
Hajra, Leena
CPSO#:
83028
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
381 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: 905 472 7068 Ext. 2
Fax: 905 472 7046
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Leena Hajra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:15 Nov 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEENA HAJRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2008 to 15 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |