THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:23:51 AM
Desilets, Stacy Ann
CPSO#:
83007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Woods, Stacy Ann (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Great Northern Family Health Team
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: (705) 6470173
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STACY ANN DESILETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESILETS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |