THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:13:04 PM
Van Vliet, Aaron James
CPSO#:
82994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 472-0221
Fax: (705) 472-9686
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON JAMES VAN VLIET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN VLIET is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: April 24, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Aaron Van Vliet was charged with the following offences:
1. Assault with a weapon, on or about April 18, 2024, contrary to section 267(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Uttering Threats to Cause Death or Bodily Harm, on or about April 18, 2024, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: April 24, 2024
Place of Charge: North Bay, Ontario
North Bay Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: April 22, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On April 22, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Aaron Van Vliet:
1. Van Vliet must notify North Bay Police Service within 48 hours in advance of any change of address.
2. Van Vliet must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named persons, save and except through counsel.
3. Van Vliet must not go to specified address, or any place where named persons live, go to school, frequent, or happen to be save and except through counsel.