THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:55:35 AM
Van Houwelingen, Andrew Peter
CPSO#:
82993
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 637-8308
Fax: (519) 207-8308
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW PETER VAN HOUWELINGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HOUWELINGEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |