THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:00:53 PM
Soliman, Hany
CPSO#:
82983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Sunnybrook Cancer Centre
Room T2-171
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4951
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Hany Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANY SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2011 |