THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:09:33 AM
Patel, Falguni
CPSO#:
82970
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rexdale Medical Clinic
Units 10 & 11
680 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9W 0B5
Phone: (416) 213-9577
Fax: (416) 213-9588
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. F. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Jul 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FALGUNI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2008 |