THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:03:23 PM
Lu, Annie
CPSO#:
82947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
21 Hamilton Street
Elora, ON
Elora ON N0B 1S0
Phone: (226) 369-0264
Fax: (226) 369-0246
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNIE LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2007 |