THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:45:59 PM
Lovshin, Julie Ann Louise
CPSO#:
82946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room H141, H Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5049
Fax: 416-480-5400
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE ANN LOUISE LOVSHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVSHIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Sep 2017
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2012 |