THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:12:14 AM
Khokhotva, Vladislav
CPSO#:
82935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: (519) 254-4154
Fax: (519) 254-4158
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VLADISLAV KHOKHOTVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOKHOTVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |